+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 129, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On July 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On July 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 5. Page 5106.).
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 5428.)
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 25).
On May 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 25).
On April 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 5, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2488 O'Donnell By Wilk
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 5
June 13, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 29, 2018: AB 2488 O'DONNELL Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 8
May 25, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
April 25, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor