+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 1. Page 5593.)
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 25).
On May 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
On March 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 31, 2018: AB 2486 MCCARTY Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 12
May 25, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
April 24, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor