+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 575, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6197.).
On August 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5120.).
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5112.)
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27).
On April 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 5).
On March 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On March 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On March 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 24, 2016: AB 2485 SANTIAGO Concurrence - Urgency Added
- Yeas: 80
August 18, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2485 Santiago By Galgiani Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
August 1, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 27, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
June 1, 2016: AB 2485 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
May 27, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 20
April 5, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor