+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On October 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 617, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 2605.).
On August 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 2145.).
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 24).
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 1217.)
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 22).
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 7).
On February 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
On February 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 27, 2015: AB 248 HERNÁNDEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 1
August 24, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB248 Roger Hernández By Monning
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 1
August 24, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB248 Roger Hernández By Monning
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 1
June 24, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
June 24, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
April 30, 2015: AB 248 HERNÁNDEZ Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 2
April 22, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
April 7, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 4
April 7, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor