+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0.)
On May 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 19).
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On April 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.M.
On March 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.M. Read second time and amended.
On March 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E.M.
On February 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (5)
August 1, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 28, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 2
May 26, 2022: AB 2477 Rodriguez Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 4
May 19, 2022: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 4
April 25, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor