+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4943.)
On May 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On May 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9).
On May 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
On May 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On April 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On March 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On March 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Vote
May 9, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor