+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 11).
On April 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH.
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 24, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
April 11, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor