+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
On February 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 7, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 7, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor