+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
On April 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage.
On April 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
On April 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 10, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 4
April 10, 2018: Reconsideration.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor