+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 9, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 53, Statutes of 2020.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 26, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5226.).
On August 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4296.).
On August 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On August 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On July 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4727.)
On June 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2).
On May 19, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 12).
On February 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 19, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 26, 2020: AB 2459 Bigelow Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 6
August 24, 2020: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2459 Bigelow et al. By Dodd
- Yeas: 40
August 14, 2020: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 16
June 8, 2020: AB 2459 Bigelow Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
June 2, 2020: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 18
May 12, 2020: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 20
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor