+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 417, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 6196.).
On August 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 5123.).
On August 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 1).
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and E. & C.A.
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 4891.)
On May 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (April 27).
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On April 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On March 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 24, 2016: AB 2455 CHIU Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 1
August 18, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2455 Chiu By Allen
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
August 1, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
June 21, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
June 15, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
May 23, 2016: AB 2455 CHIU Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 5
April 27, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
April 13, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor