+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5356.)
On May 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23).
On May 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 29).
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
On March 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and TRANS.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 29, 2014: AB 2452 PAN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
May 23, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 29, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor