+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 300, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6116.).
On August 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5015.).
On August 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 29).
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4870.)
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 11).
On April 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 20).
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
On April 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 23, 2016: AB 2450 ACHADJIAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 16, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2450 Achadjian By Monning
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
June 29, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
May 19, 2016: AB 2450 ACHADJIAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
May 11, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 20
April 20, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor