+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On September 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On August 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On August 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6059.).
On August 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4979.).
On August 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 10).
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4496.)
On April 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On April 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 29).
On March 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and ED.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 22, 2016: AB 2448 BURKE Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
August 15, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2448 Burke By Mitchell
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
May 10, 2016: Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
April 25, 2016: AB 2448 BURKE Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
March 29, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor