+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 42. Noes 30. Page 7031.).
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 5995.).
On August 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20).
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on EQ.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 26. Page 5554.)
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
On May 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 24).
On April 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On April 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On April 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and E.S. & T.M.
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 30, 2018: AB 2447 REYES Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 30
- Present/NV: 8
August 29, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2447 Reyes et al. By Lara
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 2
June 20, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 30, 2018: AB 2447 REYES Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 5
May 25, 2018: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 24, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 16, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor