+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 63, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m.
On June 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3928.).
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 4).
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4583.)
On April 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 1).
On March 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 16, 2014: Consent Calendar 2nd AB2445 Chau
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
June 4, 2014: Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 24, 2014: AB 2445 CHAU Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 6
April 1, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor