+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 540, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6978.).
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6773.)
On August 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5890.).
On August 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5425.)
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
On April 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 9).
On March 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On March 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 30, 2018: AB 2441 FRAZIER Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 28, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2441 Frazier et al. By Dodd
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 16, 2018: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
August 6, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 26, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
May 29, 2018: AB 2441 FRAZIER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
May 25, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 9, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10