+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 5209.)
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 27).
On May 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On March 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 1, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 28, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
June 2, 2016: AB 2428 TING Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 2
May 27, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 6
April 18, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor