+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On September 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 860, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5139.).
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 1).
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4595.)
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 20).
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 18, 2016: Special Consent AB2417 Cooley By Mitchell
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 3
August 1, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
June 21, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
April 28, 2016: AB 2417 COOLEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 20, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 4
April 12, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor