+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 416, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 25. Page 6485.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6474.)
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 5485.).
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 22).
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 4775.)
On May 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 5.) (May 4).
On April 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 13).
On March 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 30, 2016: AB 2414 GARCIA, E. Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 25
August 29, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2414 Eduardo Garcia By Hueso
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
August 11, 2016: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 1, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 22, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 12, 2016: AB 2414 GARCIA, E. Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 5
May 4, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 5
April 13, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor