+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On January 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 2.
On January 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
March 14, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor