+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 252, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m.
On August 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 11. Page 5876.).
On August 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 4960.).
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8).
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On January 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 14. Page 3502.)
On January 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (January 21).
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 21).
On April 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On February 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and P. & C.P.
On February 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
On February 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 18, 2016: AB 241 GORDON Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 4
August 15, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB241 Gordon By Wolk
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
June 8, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
January 27, 2016: AB 241 GORDON Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 4
January 21, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 4
April 21, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
April 21, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
April 8, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection]
- Yeas: 9
April 8, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection]
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor