+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 5. Page 5274.)
On May 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 23).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On April 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 1).
On March 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 28, 2014: AB 2406 RODRIGUEZ Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 10
May 23, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 5
April 1, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor