+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On May 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 26, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4601.)
On May 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 7).
On March 17, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On March 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
On March 12, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On February 19, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 26, 2020: AB 2398 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
May 7, 2020: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Insurance
Type:
Primary Sponsor