+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 883, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
On August 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 22. Page 6281.).
On August 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 5254.).
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 5138.)
- Withdrawn from committee.
On August 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 15).
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 4856.)
On May 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 4).
On April 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended.
On March 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
August 25, 2016: AB 2393 CAMPOS Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 1
August 22, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2393 Campos By Liu
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
May 19, 2016: AB 2393 CAMPOS Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 5
May 4, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor