+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5191.)
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23).
On May 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 8).
On March 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
May 27, 2014: AB 2391 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
May 23, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 29, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 10
April 8, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Ian Calderon
Type:
Primary Sponsor