+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On March 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
On February 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
On February 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
March 23, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 7
March 23, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 7
March 23, 2015: Reconsideration.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor