+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 62, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m.
On June 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3930.).
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 10).
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4966.)
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 6).
On April 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 8).
On March 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
June 16, 2014: Consent Calendar 2nd AB2379 Weber
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
June 10, 2014: Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 15, 2014: AB 2379 WEBER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
May 6, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 10
April 8, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor