+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On July 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on EQ.
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 13. Page 4715.)
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 4700.)
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On June 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 3).
On June 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 5, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On May 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On March 17, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On February 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 19, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
June 8, 2020: AB 2371 Friedman Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 4
June 3, 2020: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 5
May 13, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3