+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 424, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 14. Page 6114.).
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 4493.).
On June 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 17).
On June 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 12. Page 5005.)
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (May 6).
On April 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
August 18, 2014: AB 2370 CHAU Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 2
August 14, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2370 Chau By Lara
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 6
May 19, 2014: AB 2370 CHAU Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 5
May 6, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor