+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On April 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
On April 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
On March 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Vote
April 28, 2014: Be referred to Committee on Judiciary.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor