+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 573, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6460.).
On August 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5425.).
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS.
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4788.)
On May 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 4).
On April 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
On March 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On March 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
On March 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on INS. and AGING & L.T.C.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 30, 2016: AB 2366 DABABNEH Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 25, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2366 Dababneh By Gaines
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
June 22, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 12, 2016: AB 2366 DABABNEH Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 4, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 20
April 19, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 6, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Aging and Long-Term Care]
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor