+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 783, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4981.).
On August 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4933.)
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19).
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On March 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (6)
August 23, 2022: Special Consent AB2365
- Yeas: 40
August 1, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 29, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2022: AB 2365 Patterson Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 2
May 19, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
March 29, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15