+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On August 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On August 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 5698.).
On August 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 5592.)
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 25).
On April 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On April 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On April 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On April 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
On April 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and A. & A.R.
On February 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
On February 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 24, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2361 Weber et al. By Lara
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 4
August 6, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 27, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
May 31, 2018: AB 2361 WEBER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 2
May 25, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 25, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 17, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor