+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 26, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 5349.).
On August 28, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 4401.).
On August 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20).
On August 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (August 1).
On July 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On July 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 12. Page 4762.)
On June 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 3).
On June 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 19, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (May 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
On April 6, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On February 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 19, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 30, 2020: AB 2360 Maienschein Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 17
August 28, 2020: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2360 Maienschein By Mitchell
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 3
August 13, 2020: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
August 1, 2020: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 10, 2020: AB 2360 Maienschein Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 3
June 3, 2020: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 5
May 18, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor