+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On April 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor