+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died on inactive file.
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Berman.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1464.)
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 28).
On April 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On March 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
On March 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. Read second time and amended.
On January 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
On January 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 13.
On January 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (2)
April 28, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
April 15, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1