+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (39)
On September 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 704, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On August 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 7170.).
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 31).
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 7122.)
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 6140.).
On August 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On August 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (August 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On August 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 5603.)
- Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 5603.)
On August 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- From inactive file.
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- Ordered to second reading.
On September 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hill.
On August 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 21).
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1388.)
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
On March 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 15).
On March 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On February 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On January 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 2.
On January 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 31, 2018: AB 235 O'Donnell Concurrence - Urgency Added
- Yeas: 80
August 31, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB235 O'Donnell By Lara Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
August 31, 2018: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 7
August 21, 2017: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
July 12, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 4, 2017: AB 235 O'DONNELL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 26, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
March 15, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor