+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 385, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On August 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6044.).
On August 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4981.).
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21).
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5007.)
On May 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4887.)
On April 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On March 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 29).
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On March 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 22, 2016: AB 2349 CHIU Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
August 15, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2349 Chiu By Leno
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
June 21, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 31, 2016: AB 2349 CHIU Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
March 29, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor