+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 636, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 5. Page 6214.).
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 3. Page 4553.).
On August 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 17).
On June 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 4. Page 5016.)
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 14).
On April 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On March 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 20, 2014: AB 2344 AMMIANO Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 9
August 18, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2344 Ammiano By Jackson
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 9
June 17, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 19, 2014: AB 2344 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 13
May 14, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
April 29, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor