+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 298, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 8. Page 6371.).
On August 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 5289.).
On August 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on EQ.
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 9. Page 4824.)
On April 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On April 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 9).
On March 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
On February 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
August 20, 2018: AB 2341 MATHIS Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 7
August 13, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2341 Mathis et al. By Wiener
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 5
April 23, 2018: AB 2341 MATHIS Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 8
April 9, 2018: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2