+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On October 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 616, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 15. Page 3135.).
On September 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2693.).
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 10. Page 1373.)
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 15).
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
On February 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 11, 2015: AB 234 GORDON Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 2
September 10, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB234 Gordon By Wolk
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 13
June 24, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
June 24, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 11, 2015: AB 234 GORDON Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 8
April 15, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
April 7, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
April 7, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor