+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On October 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 449, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 2328.).
On August 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
On August 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On August 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 2591.).
On August 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
On February 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
September 11, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB234 Gatto By De León Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
August 19, 2013: AB 234 GATTO Third Reading Urgency
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
August 14, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor