+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 911, Statutes of 2022.
On September 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.).
On August 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5221.).
On August 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21).
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- 6-16-2022 hearing rescheduled by committee to 6-15-2022
On June 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 4579.)
On April 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 27).
On March 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 29).
On March 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
On February 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (8)
August 30, 2022: AB 2329 Carrillo Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
August 29, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2329 Carrillo et al. By Durazo
- Yeas: 40
June 21, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
June 15, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 5, 2022: AB 2329 Carrillo Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 17
April 27, 2022: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
March 29, 2022: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
March 23, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 7