+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5065.)
On May 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (May 13).
On May 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On April 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On March 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Vote
May 13, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor