+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 258, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5046.).
On June 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8).
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E.Q.
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On March 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4113.)
On March 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On March 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 22).
On March 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
On March 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
On March 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On February 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (4)
August 24, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2327 E.S. & T.M. (Quirk) By Allen
- Yeas: 40
June 8, 2022: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
March 31, 2022: AB 2327 E.S. & T.M. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 8
March 22, 2022: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials
Type:
Primary Sponsor