+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 528, Statutes of 2022.
On August 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5983.).
On August 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4906.).
On August 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- From Consent Calendar.
- Ordered to third reading.
On June 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5035.)
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
On May 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 26).
On April 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
August 22, 2022: AB 2326 Reyes Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
August 18, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2326 Reyes et al. By Leyva
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 14, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
June 8, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
May 25, 2022: AB 2326 Reyes Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 5
May 18, 2022: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
April 26, 2022: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1