+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24).
On April 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and PUB. S.
On February 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
On February 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 24, 2018: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
April 17, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor