+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 914, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6370.).
On August 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5271.).
On August 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4645.)
On April 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 4).
On March 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On March 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
On February 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 20, 2018: AB 2322 DALY Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 13, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2322 Daly By Wieckowski
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
May 15, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
April 12, 2018: AB 2322 DALY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 9
April 4, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
March 19, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor