+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and V.A.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1923.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
On May 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On April 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On January 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 17.
On January 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
May 23, 2019: AB 232 Cervantes Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 18
May 16, 2019: Noes:
- Yeas: 18
April 23, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
April 8, 2019: Be re-referred to the Committee on [Health]
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor